TIFERETH BENEVOLENT FUND LIMITED

Charity number: 251737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The company's objects are to foster, assist and promote the charitable activities of any institutions professing and teaching the principles of traditional Judaism and also the relief of poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £39,463
Total expenditure: £32,173

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PINCHAS NEUMANN Trustee 01 April 2015
BEAULAND LIMITED
Received: On time
MAURICE NEUMANN Trustee
MELODOR LIMITED
Received: On time
Hyman Weiss Trustee
MELODOR LIMITED
Received: On time
BEIS MINCHAS YITZCHOK TRUST
Received: On time
LOCALTRENT LIMITED
Received: On time
KOLEISS ZEDOKOH LIMITED
Received: On time
ARDINA LIMITED
Received: On time
PHILIP WEISS Trustee
ARDINA LIMITED
Received: On time
MELODOR LIMITED
Received: On time
BEIS MINCHAS YITZCHOK TRUST
Received: On time
LOCALTRENT LIMITED
Received: On time
KOLEISS ZEDOKOH LIMITED
Received: On time
HENRY NEUMANN Trustee
LEV CHAIM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.14k £188.08k £18.73k £19.39k £39.46k
Total expenditure £5.63k £113.66k £42.81k £27.19k £32.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1st Floor Cloister House
New Bailey St.
Manchester
Phone:
01618328721
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available