Financial history THE KING'S COLLEGE HOSPITAL NURSES' LEAGUE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 251743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.18k £8.11k £18.76k £7.52k £43.17k
Total expenditure £15.23k £14.48k £15.06k £12.90k £10.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A