ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES - THE CONGREGATION OF THE CANONESSES REGULAR HOSPITALLERS OF THE MERCY OF JESUS OF THE ORDER OF ST AUGUSTINE AT INCE BLUNDELL

Charity number: 251782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £963.94k £736.11k £912.55k £867.72k £959.90k
Total expenditure £989.08k £919.67k £1.05m £1.15m £1.12m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £41.86k £19.40k £146.16k £11.40k £21.66k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £818.33k £632.34k £681.37k £768.95k £835.10k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £103.75k £84.36k £85.02k £87.37k £103.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £41.86k £19.40k £146.16k £11.40k £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £972.19k £859.79k £947.44k £1.02m £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.90k £16.90k £11.50k £16.36k £16.84k
Expenditure - Governance £42.51k £0 £91.51k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £16.90k £16.90k £11.50k £16.36k £16.84k
Expenditure - Other £0 £42.99k £91.51k £109.95k £37.32k