Financial history AGE CONCERN HAYLING ISLAND

Charity number: 251920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £20.75k £17.76k £47.86k £15.80k £24.85k
Total expenditure £14.31k £34.60k £35.86k £4.69k £31.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £34.06k £12.16k £14.00k