Trustees THE HOWARD LEAGUE FOR PENAL REFORM (INCORPORATING THE HOWARD CENTRE FOR PENOLOGY)

Charity number: 251926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Fergus McNeill Chair 14 November 2018
None on record
Ian West Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Christina Line Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Thalia Maragh Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Andrew Morris Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Tomas William Thurogood-Hyde Trustee 12 December 2023
None on record
Charles Bland Trustee 12 December 2023
None on record
Alexandra Marks Trustee 29 November 2022
STANDING TALL CIO
Received: On time
JOHN TRESS Trustee 29 November 2022
None on record
Dr Zubaida Haque Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Professor Ben Bradford Trustee 12 November 2019
None on record