Accounts and annual returns WESTLEIGH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 251949
Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 107 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 472 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 472 days
Annual return 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 838 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 838 days
Annual return 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1203 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1203 days
Annual return 01 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1568 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1568 days