THE COMMUNITY TRUST OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY

Charity number: 252222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 19 July 2016 On time Download