Financial history THE JERSEY CATTLE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 252271
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £226.06k £221.15k £238.29k £200.30k £179.88k
Total expenditure £241.98k £222.09k £258.07k £180.41k £176.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A