Dogfen lywodraethu THE JERSEY CATTLE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JULY 1883 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 JUNE 1957, 14 FEBRUARY 1968, 21 MAY 1977, 24 NOVEMBER 1998, 23 OCTOBER 2007 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED 30/7/13 as amended on 07 Aug 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO MAINTAIN THE PURITY AND IMPROVE THE GENETIC MERIT OF JERSEY CATTLE BRED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. GENERALLY TO PROMOTE THE BREED OF JERSEY CATTLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE THE KNOWLEDGE AND INTEREST IN THE JERSEY CATTLE BREED BY MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY.'
Maes buddion
THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.