Trustees THE JERSEY CATTLE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Charity number: 252271

Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK LOGAN | Chair | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Waller | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Arrell | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Thomas Hunter | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Hume | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gordon Stuart DAVIS | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bland | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.