Accounts and annual returns THOMAS TOKE CHARITY

Charity number: 252405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required