Financial history THOMAS TOKE CHARITY

Charity number: 252405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £15.85k £15.96k £16.23k £16.42k £16.24k
Total expenditure £10.89k £30.06k £13.45k £17.88k £7.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A