ENVILLE SENIOR CITIZENS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 252412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 23 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required