DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS

Charity Number: 252468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The study and exchange of information and ideas on all matters concerning the County of Devon; in particular its geology, geography, buildings,flora and fauna, history,literature, dialect and arts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £89,061
Total expenditure: £67,780

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 August 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Pocock Chair 03 June 2017
None on record
Cheryl Anne Tachon Trustee 01 August 2024
DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS
Recently registered
Mark Norman Trustee 09 September 2023
DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS
Recently registered
Hazel Joy Harland Trustee 09 September 2023
DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS
Recently registered
Professor William Hamilton Trustee 09 September 2023
DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS
Recently registered
Charles John Haslam Trustee 03 September 2022
DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS
Recently registered
DEREK WILLIAM SMITHERS Trustee 03 October 2020
None on record
Dr Ian Varndell Trustee 02 June 2019
EXETER DISSENTERS' GRAVEYARD TRUST
Received: On time
PROFESSOR MALCOLM BARRIE HART Trustee 18 June 2011
DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £57.30k £43.32k £66.07k £65.99k £89.06k
Total expenditure £49.23k £51.05k £69.32k £70.10k £67.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Devonshire Association
Unit 10
Chitterley Business Centre
Silverton
EXETER
EX5 4DB
Phone:
01392 860456