Accounts and annual returns THE HAWKHURST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 252641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window