Financial history THE LONDON MATHEMATICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 252660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £2.99m £3.15m £3.08m £3.15m £2.92m
Total expenditure £2.63m £2.70m £2.81m £2.36m £2.28m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.70k £3.93k £41.78k £144.24k £260.43k
Income - Other trading activities £333.01k £365.26k £261.23k £124.42k £142.86k
Income - Charitable activities £2.16m £2.26m £2.24m £2.35m £1.98m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £485.87k £518.90k £529.67k £502.61k £531.72k
Income - Other £5.27k £4.01k £7.26k £24.97k £3.78k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.31m £2.39m £2.49m £2.09m £2.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £317.50k £309.53k £314.30k £275.87k £270.51k
Expenditure - Governance £297.40k £300.88k £311.05k £257.04k £244.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £566.38k £618.31k £737.92k £304.62k £495.61k
Expenditure - Investment management £55.77k £55.14k £52.60k £53.06k £59.87k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0