Trustees THE LONDON MATHEMATICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 252660

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Jason Lotay | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sarah Whitehouse | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Dominica Newton | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ulrike Luise Tillmann FRS | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Anne Enright | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sara Lombardo | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Amanda Georgina Turner | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Niall James MacKay | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon Montague Salamon | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MINHYONG KIM | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Brian Ashwin | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nicholas Robb McDonald | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frank Neumann | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Iain Grant Gordon | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Elaine Craig Mackay Crooks | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM PARKER | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANNE TAORMINA | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kevin Houston | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Professor Andrew Stuart Dancer | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CATHERINE ANN HOBBS | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.