Financial history BRITISH BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 252750
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.18k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.65k £265 £1.76k £1.58k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A