THE ROYAL ALBERT INSTITUTE FUND

Charity number: 252864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required