THE ROYAL ALBERT INSTITUTE FUND

Charity number: 252864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.21k £12.59k £13.18k £13.74k £12.04k
Total expenditure £11.90k £10.94k £11.01k £10.87k £14.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A