THE ROYAL ALBERT INSTITUTE FUND

Charity number: 252864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Palmer-Scott Trustee 05 June 2013 None on record
Linda Jean Aitken Trustee 06 June 2017
THE WINDSOR FESTIVAL SOCIETY LIMITED Received: On time
KEITH DOUGLAS HILL Trustee 12 June 2002 None on record
DAVID FRANCIS OSMOND Trustee 06 June 2018
WINDSOR & ETON ROTARY CHARITY Received: On time
PENELOPE ANNE BRANCH Trustee 01 November 2000 None on record
PETER FRANK GRAY MBE Trustee 20 February 1989
THE NEW WINDSOR MUNICIPAL CHARITIES Received: On time
THE WINDSOR ROYAL FREE FOUNDATION Received: On time
ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION WINDSOR BRANCH Received: On time
CLEWER NON - ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH USSHER Trustee 28 June 1999 None on record