Financial history ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity number: 252878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £28.07m £28.16m £16.03m £13.87m £17.33m
Total expenditure £27.35m £27.89m £16.22m £14.27m £14.94m
Income from government contracts £10.36m £6.25m N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £437.43k N/A N/A £463.00k £150.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £11.24m £12.25m £10.22m £9.59m £10.46m
Income - Other trading activities £2.34m £2.15m £2.57m £1.43m £1.50m
Income - Charitable activities £12.78m £8.91m £2.09m £1.49m £2.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £792.00k £589.00k £771.00k £495.00k £404.00k
Income - Other £909.00k £4.26m £372.00k £865.00k £2.74m
Income - Legacies £987.00k £2.54m £1.36m £906.00k £1.49m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £26.80m £27.37m £15.93m £14.09m £14.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £545.00k £527.00k £296.00k £181.00k £176.00k
Expenditure - Governance £98.00k £120.00k £192.00k £189.00k £193.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £461.00k £4.34m £24.00k £95.00k £381.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £196.00k £150.00k £150.00k £172.00k £175.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0