CHARITY OF ROBINSON AND OTHERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the language of the 1648 trust deed - for the use and behoof of the poor within the ancient Parish of Kirkham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 27 July 1967: Standard registration
- ROBINSON'S CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Adrian Jacob Long | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Antony Dashwood | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John O'Brien | Trustee | 14 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £843 | £843 | £843 | £843 | £844 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
24TH JANUARY 1648 (P.R. VOL. 11 PAGES 259 AND 260)
Charitable objects
ú2.50 OF THE INCOME TO BE PAID YEARLY TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF A PREACHING MINISTER AT LUND CHAPEL IN CLIFTON WITH SALWICK. IN THE EVENT OF A VACANCY OF SUCH MINISTER FOR AND TOWARDS THE PREFERMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOLMASTER, TO TEACH AT A GRAMMER SCHOOL WITHIN THE SEVERAL TOWNSHIPS OF CLIFTON SALWICK OR NEWTON CUM SCALES. THE REMAINDER OF THE YEARLY INCOME FOR THE USE AND BEHOOF OF THE POOR WITHIN THE PARISH OF KIRKHAM.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
CHURCH STREET
KIRKHAM
PRESTON
PR4 2SE
- Phone:
- 01772687076
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window