Accounts and annual returns SUFFOLK CONSTABULARY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 253149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 April 2021 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2019 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required