Financial history SUFFOLK CONSTABULARY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 253149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.32k £40.09k £23.16k £36.52k £27.28k
Total expenditure £13.78k £13.17k £17.10k £28.20k £19.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A