ST STEPHENS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 253170
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 15 January 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 15 January 2021 17 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 10 January 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 10 January 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 13 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 21 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 21 September 2016 On time Download