THE ANNA MARIA COOPER CHARITY

Charity number: 253315
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is dormant and there are no current activities. The income is used to offset costs for the Sunday School at St John the Baptist Church Westbourne.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019

Total income: £46
Total expenditure: £46

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 September 1967: Standard registration
  • 07 May 2021: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 07 May 2021: Funds transferred to 1130732 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
  • 07 May 2021: Funds transferred to 1130732 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £42 £41 £61 £45 £46
Total expenditure £42 £41 £61 £45 £46
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required