WOUGHTON-ON-THE-GREEN WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 253326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £648 £690 £713 £731 £729
Total expenditure £1.10k £1.17k £435 £1.78k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A