Trustees BRITISH-ITALIAN SOCIETY
Charity number: 253386

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD NORTHERN MBE | Chair | 18 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Moorehead OBE | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Arthur Gilbert Punt | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Silvia Badiali | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jane Everson | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARIA BEATRICE PANICO CROSSLEY | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SILVIA PIERETTI | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
TINA VILLAROSA | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
EUGENIO BOSCO | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
SIDNEY CELIA ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.