GEMILUTH CHESED AND ENDOWMENT OF BRIDES SOCIETY

Charity number: 253388
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £114.74k £121.38k £134.27k £141.38k £128.04k
Total expenditure £113.78k £134.81k £115.21k £160.51k £119.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £9.96k