MARY DAINS'S MISSION AND HOLIDAY FUND CHARITY

Charity number: 253412
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020
Annual return 31 December 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019
Annual return 31 December 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018
Annual return 31 December 2017
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017
Annual return 31 December 2016
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016