MARY DAINS'S MISSION AND HOLIDAY FUND CHARITY

Charity number: 253412
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.09k £2.53k £2.53k £1.81k £1.38k
Total expenditure £284 £294 £296 £307 £305
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A