Trustees BRITISH CHARITY FUND - BERNE
Charity number: 253480
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Konecki | Chair | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robertson | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Marshall | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Avis Morgan | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert J Dean | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Palmesino MBE | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gill Howie | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.