Trustees THE HARLEIAN SOCIETY INCORPORATED 1902

Charity number: 253659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir THOMAS WOODCOCK KCVO DL Chair 31 July 1996
SLAIDBURN ARCHIVE
Received: On time
THE LANCASHIRE PARISH REGISTER SOCIETY
Received: On time
COLLEGE OF ARMS TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Dominic Charles Davenport Ingram Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN ROGERS Trustee 20 June 2018
MONUMENTAL BRASS SOCIETY
Received: On time
Nicolas John Bell Trustee 21 June 2017
THE VAUGHAN WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BENEDICTS, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
VAUGHAN WILLIAMS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MUSICI TRUST
Received: On time
GILES HOWARD MANDELBROTE FSA Trustee 17 June 2015
PRINTING HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: 9 days late
FRIENDS OF LAMBETH PALACE LIBRARY
Received: On time
KATHARINE OWEN FSA Trustee 18 June 2014
None on record
PROFESSOR RICHARD PURY CUST Trustee 01 October 2012
None on record
ALAN ROGER DICKINS Trustee 19 June 2012
None on record
MR JOE EDWARDS Trustee 25 June 2002
FOUNDATION FOR MEDIEVAL GENEALOGY
Received: On time
Dr ADRIAN PETER AILES Trustee 12 May 1987
None on record
CAROL PENELOPE HARTLEY Trustee 12 May 1987
None on record