ST NEOTS AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 253740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 12 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 12 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download