Financial history ST NEOTS AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 253740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £97.01k £66.85k £77.25k £89.72k £165.48k
Total expenditure £76.55k £60.58k £69.14k £86.30k £132.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.30k
Income from government grants £60.25k £60.60k £61.78k £61.72k £73.20k