ST. MARY'S WITH ST. GEORGE'S GERMAN LUTHERAN CHURCH

Charity number: 253762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Bernd Rapp Trustee 01 August 2016
GERMAN CHURCH SYDENHAM Received: On time
THE LUTHERAN COUNCIL OF GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
Martin Liebscher Trustee 15 September 2015 None on record
Dr Matthias Klammer Trustee 15 September 2013 None on record
BAERBEL GRANGE Trustee None on record
Anne-Caroline Meyer Trustee 24 November 2019 None on record
Dr GUDRUN STENBECK Trustee None on record
Georg Little Trustee 13 May 2018 None on record