LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ABERYSTWYTH HOSPITALS AND WELFARE HOMES

Charity number: 253992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To work for the welfare of the patients and staff of Bronglais Hospital, Aberystwyth and the Community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,057
Total expenditure: £12,874

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Ceredigion

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CYNRHAIR CYFEILLION YSBYTY BRONGLAIS A'R CYMUNED (Working name)
  • CYNRHAIR CYFEILLION YSBYTY BRONGLAIS A'R CYMYMED (Working name)
  • LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF BRONGLAIS HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elinor Powell Chair 20 June 2023
None on record
Victoria Foale Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Rhian Elisabeth Davies Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.49k £16.36k £6.10k £19.97k £14.06k
Total expenditure £2.73k £67.08k £5.04k £5.36k £12.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 February 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 March 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Clos Winifred
BORTH
Ceredigion
SY24 5LE
Phone:
07773785734
Website:

No information available