ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF ARCHBISHOP TENISON

Charity number: 254254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £14.46k £14.36k £14.67k £14.87k £14.50k
Total expenditure £13.15k £13.83k £14.25k £14.93k £14.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A