COFTON HACKETT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hires the hall at an affordable rent to other local organisations and local residents for meetings and events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 04 December 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER WEBB | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Ward | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ward | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Deeming | Trustee | 03 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
Richard Deeming | Trustee | 01 January 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.26k | £24.07k | £15.32k | £8.81k | £7.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.21k | £21.42k | £13.74k | £10.53k | £6.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | £19.43k | £3.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 OCTOBER 1967
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BUILDING OF A VILLAGE HALL IN COFTON HACKETT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PARISH AND NEIGBOURING AREAS.
Area of benefit
COFTON HACKETT AND NEAR BY NEIGHBOURING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Oakfield Drive
Cofton Hackett
Rednal
Birmingham
B45 8AN
- Phone:
- 01214452451
- Email:
- jennie@ch-villagehall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window