CWMCARN OLD AGE PENSIONERS HALL AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 254419
Charity reporting is overdue by 762 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 396 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 396 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 762 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 762 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required