CWMCARN OLD AGE PENSIONERS HALL AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 254419
Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £18.55k £9.70k £10.00k £19.75k £17.67k
Total expenditure £7.83k £9.29k £10.34k £9.37k £7.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0