LONDON WIMBLEDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 254496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.96k £6.58k £9.49k £25.37k £17.73k
Total expenditure £6.18k £8.07k £4.92k £12.83k £17.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A