LONDON WIMBLEDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 254496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oluyomi Williams Trustee 19 May 2018 None on record
Peter Stafford Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
DAVID JONATHAN RUSHTON Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
KEN GRACIAS Trustee None on record
Simon Douglas Trustee 10 May 2013 None on record
WILBERT KNOX Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
JOHN MORLEY Chair None on record
Guy Sweny Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Masatoshi Hatori Trustee 16 December 2017 None on record
WILLIAM DALLAS Trustee None on record