THE DISABLED DRIVERS' ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 254544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required