ROFFEY PARK INSTITUTE LIMITED

Charity number: 254591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.18m £5.51m £7.05m £6.70m £4.70m
Total expenditure £6.54m £5.50m £5.88m £6.48m £6.29m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £1.58m £430.92k £1.15m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £689.22k £1.03m £0 £1.15m £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.49m £4.48m £6.56m £5.56m £4.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.36k
Income - Other £0 £0 £483.13k £0 £215.13k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.91m £4.72m £5.03m £5.60m £5.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £632.17k £777.95k £857.88k £871.25k £606.99k
Expenditure - Governance £63.42k £68.46k £65.29k £0 £99.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0