ROFFEY PARK INSTITUTE LIMITED

Charity number: 254591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL PERKS Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
MATTHEW JASON HAWORTH Trustee 25 May 2018 None on record
ALISON JANE RITCHIE Trustee 22 May 2009 None on record
SEBASTIAN MICHAEL HUMFREY LING Trustee 15 July 2016 None on record
JIGNESH RAMJI Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
MICHAEL DECLAN GUERIN Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
ANDREW BAILEY Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
JANET MORRIS Trustee 09 April 2020
UNITED WORLD SCHOOLS Received: On time
ROGER JOHN LEEK Chair 17 November 2017 None on record
CHARLES STUART HORTON Trustee 16 November 2006 None on record