SHALDON OVER-SIXTY CLUB

Charity number: 254770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.95k £5.49k £5.81k £6.92k £9.58k
Total expenditure £4.56k £4.41k £5.24k £5.66k £5.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A