Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF CAROLINE P ANSTRUTHER MACKAY

Charity number: 254866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required