CRANMER HALL

Charity number: 254930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Current activities involve purchase of Christian literature and support of Christian activities for the benefit of the people of Ilfracombe and especially of those in the parish of St Philip and St James.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £3,961
Total expenditure: £2,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Ruoff Trustee 15 March 2023
CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Judith Hunter Trustee 04 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES, ILFRACOMBE
Received: On time
NIGEL JOHN VINCE Trustee
THE ROTARY CLUB OF ILFRACOMBE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES, ILFRACOMBE
Received: On time
BRENDAN CASSIDY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.52k £3.50k £3.61k £3.78k £3.96k
Total expenditure £2.00k £7.50k £2.50k £6.45k £2.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CODICIL TO WILL PROVED IN THE P.P.R. 01.11.1951 AND SCHEME OF THE 18.10.1969
Charitable objects
1/ TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PHILIP AND ST. JAMES, ILFRACOMBE. 2/ CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ILFRACOMBE.
Area of benefit
ILFRACOMBE
Registration history
  • 01 February 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE ROCK
GRANVILLE ROAD
ILFRACOMBE
EX34 8AS
Phone:
01271862255
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available